VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to provide a good quality village hall facility and services at affordable hire rates, for residents and clubs from our local area, for leisure, pleasure, social and educational purposes. To fund this we use the lettings income and hold fund-raising events. We believe this benefits, promotes & enhances good community relations between residents and local, mainly voluntary groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 11 November 1962: Standard registration
- CAMPS VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- CASTLE CAMPS VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melanie Laing | Chair | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Smith | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Peirson | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Shepherd | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Garbutt | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Parkinson | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JO BISHOP | Trustee | 06 August 2007 |
|
|
||||
TERRY CHAPMAN | Trustee | 19 May 1997 |
|
|
||||
SUSIE CULPIN | Trustee | 01 June 1981 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.50k | £13.17k | £21.42k | £11.79k | £18.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.79k | £8.01k | £17.98k | £13.65k | £18.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | £250 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 13 MAY 1952
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CASTLE CAMPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NEW HOUSE
CAMPS END
CASTLE CAMPS
CAMBRIDGE
CB21 4TR
- Phone:
- 01799584457
- Email:
- terry.chapmanccpc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window