CAXTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of village hall on behalf of Parish Council
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 20 March 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John Rundell | Chair | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cllr David Cronk | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Elizabeth Glover | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Louise Peters | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Messenger | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Halket | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Thomas | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Mary Richards | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Barbour | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christina Mary Harrison | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.72k | £24.84k | £13.45k | £7.27k | £8.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.36k | £5.78k | £7.53k | £9.18k | £11.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.71k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 13 OCTOBER 1969
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
CAXTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Ermine Street
Caxton
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 3PQ
- Phone:
- 07793813046
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window