Financial history WAR MEMORIAL VILLAGE HALL AND INSTITUTE

Charity number: 300405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £16.00k £20.81k £20.94k £19.02k £21.42k
Total expenditure £26.06k £16.44k £20.36k £26.56k £25.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £17.91k N/A N/A