COLLIER'S RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a playing field which is managed by Stapleford Parish Council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 16 July 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAMBS COUNTY COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £1 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £158 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 22 DECEMBER 1922 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1930
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND FOR THE CHILDREN OF THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STAPLEFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAMBRIDGESHIRE COUNTY COUNCIL
SHIRE HALL
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0AP
- Phone:
- 01223717359
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window