Trustees UPWELL PLAYING FIELD
Charity Number: 300425

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSAMOND SHORTING | Chair | 13 March 2000 |
|
|||||
ALEX PARNELL MR | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JASON BEST | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BIDWELL | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE AMANDA THORPE | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CHRISTINE THORPE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK STUART ELLIOTT | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS ROS SHORTING | Trustee | 12 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM SPIKINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT MOAT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.