6TH AMPTHILL AND WOBURN SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Group's charitable objective is the development of young people by helping them to achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities, by producing an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progressive training guided by the adult leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 11 May 1964: Standard registration
- ASPLEY GUISE AND WOBURN SANDS SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- 68TH BEDFORDSHIRE, ASPLEY GUISE BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 6TH ANTHILL AND WOBURN SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Wishart | Chair | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Bethell | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Jones | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WOOLSEY | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE PAPWORTH | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|||||
CATHERINE ELLIS | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHARON SMITH | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE TOBIN | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.11k | £24.61k | £36.35k | £34.43k | £36.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.33k | £28.32k | £28.95k | £34.69k | £34.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH NOVEMBER 1963.
Charitable objects
68TH BEDFORDSHIRE, ASPLEY GUISE, BOY SCOUT GROUP.
Area of benefit
ASPLEY GUISE AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 BROWNS WAY
ASPLEY GUISE
MILTON KEYNES
MK17 8JA
- Phone:
- 07971910638
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window