4TH DUNSTABLE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 18 October 1961: Standard registration
- 57TH BEDFORDSHIRE 4TH DUNSTABLE GROUP OF BOY SCOUTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kendall Morris | Chair | 12 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Linda Rooney | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Blake | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Crosby | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jephcott | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jo Crosby | Trustee | 08 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mandie Townend | Trustee | 12 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andy Townend | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.59k | £66.15k | £215.63k | £33.77k | £27.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.03k | £5.26k | £51.73k | £183.34k | £43.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £44.81k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 557 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 February 2022 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 February 2023 | 462 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL,INTELLECTUAL,SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS,AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL,NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
DUNSTABLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4th Dunstable Scout Group
109 Jeans Way
DUNSTABLE
Bedfordshire
LU5 4PR
- Phone:
- 01582667341
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window