Trustees Flitwick Scout Group

Charity number: 300454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Smith Chair 01 September 2012
None on record
Dr Alice Butler Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Jessica Greasby Trustee 25 June 2024
None on record
Daljit Bhasin Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
Kathryn Louise Singleton Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Darren John Reeve Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Simon Peter Baldwin Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
PAUL GILBEY Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
PHILLIP RUTT Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
BARRY HODGKINSON Trustee
None on record
MRS NICKY TAYLOR Trustee
None on record