101ST BEDFORD SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offer an activity based club for children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
Governance
- 05 September 1961: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 May 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN IRVINE | Chair | 17 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Hans Ola Mattsson | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hutchinson | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Keith Reavy | Trustee | 06 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Hampshire | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DARRYL BUSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.04k | £3.26k | £5.99k | £8.24k | £8.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.75k | £3.65k | £6.22k | £6.73k | £7.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 17.12.1969 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED OF 1955.
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE 101ST BEDFORDSHIRE SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
KEMPSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Austin Canons Way
Kempston
BEDFORD
MK42 8DY
- Phone:
- 07903575124
- Email:
- jamesdchampshire@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window