Trustees LEIGHTON BUZZARD CHURCH SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 300464

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Yarranton | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Downing | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Lowman | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Corkett | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Yarranton | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Fardell | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Fuller | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Casey | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Fuller | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Gregory | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.