PINKNEYS GREEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of scouting is to contribute to the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national, and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 22 October 1965: Standard registration
- PINKNEYS GREEN SCOUTS (Working name)
- PINKNEYS GREEN BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kim Crown | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
natasha Medhurst | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Myles Andrew Rankin | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Puddephatt | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Marshall | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Marshall | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON PETA ALMOND | Trustee | 21 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ERICA HUNTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
SIMON DEREK WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE COURTIER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.96k | £44.01k | £33.12k | £53.73k | £51.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.71k | £28.30k | £34.85k | £47.43k | £50.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED, 1955 ASSIGNMENT DATED 1ST MAY, 1965
Charitable objects
UNIT OF BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
PINKNEYS GREEN MAIDENHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pinkneys Green Scouts
Scout Hall
Winter Hill Road
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 6NS
- Phone:
- 01628771991
- Email:
- pgtreasurer@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window