1ST THATCHAM ST MARY'S SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Association provide educational and fun activites as part of a balanced programme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 08 October 1963: Standard registration
- 1ST THATCHAM SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 43RD NEWBURY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Will Pickering | Chair | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tollman | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Alan Hutchins | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marc Alderman | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.63k | £20.94k | £17.31k | £14.64k | £16.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.90k | £6.36k | £9.02k | £17.10k | £45.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.24k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 5TH AUGUST 1939 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1935.
Charitable objects
43RD NEWBURY BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
NEWBURY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Thatcham Scout Group
Thackeray Lane
THATCHAM
Berkshire
RG19 3AE
- Phone:
- 01635 863620
- Email:
- info@1st-thatcham.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window