1ST WOODLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Organisation activities for boys and girls aged 6 years to 14 years of age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wokingham
Governance
- 29 September 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keri Benham-Annetts | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard Nelson | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tarah Thumwood | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Milam | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Victor Baker | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Kate Lloyd | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Wynn-MacKenzie | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Jones | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Garner | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Marjorie Franklin | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA GRACE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.57k | £17.54k | £30.60k | £37.89k | £43.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.76k | £10.43k | £18.91k | £37.44k | £47.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.70k | £19.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD MAY 1971
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
WOODLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 SOUTH LAKE CRESCENT
WOODLEY
READING
RG5 3QW
- Phone:
- 0118 9690008
- Email:
- info@1stwoodley.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window