CALSTOCK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Private function hire, occasional cafe, music and performance events, coffee mornings, sports and recreational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 19 March 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Manning | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lilly Russell | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Brennan | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Tibbins | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Sylvia Barbara Millar | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morton | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Stoneman | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Mulvihill | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Taylor | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL LANE | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julian Clinkard | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.96k | £22.84k | £20.07k | £39.43k | £59.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.87k | £4.01k | £9.00k | £13.70k | £44.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AND DEED POLL DATED 10 MARCH 1969
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CALSTOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE QUAY
CALSTOCK
CORNWALL
PL18 9QA
- Phone:
- 01822834418
- Email:
- admin@calstockhall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window