Trustees CALSTOCK VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 300522

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Manning | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lilly Russell | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Brennan | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Tibbins | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Sylvia Barbara Millar | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morton | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Stoneman | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Mulvihill | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Taylor | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL LANE | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julian Clinkard | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LANE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.