Financial history CAMBORNE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 300523
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.40k £74.24k £311.40k £212.48k £184.16k
Total expenditure £90.14k £86.32k £130.35k £116.36k £119.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £45.55k £234.36k £3.00k N/A