Financial history THE LEEDSTOWN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £15.90k £19.91k £12.93k £11.77k £14.30k
Total expenditure £15.25k £6.43k £8.02k £8.87k £8.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.49k £17.45k £10.49k N/A N/A