Financial history HELLAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.29k £10.78k £1.89k £4.16k £10.52k
Total expenditure £5.66k £1.13k £8.11k £12.33k £6.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A