LAMORNA VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lamorna Village Hall is a granite built ex school house. It aims to serve the community by providing a central maintained venue for community activities. There is a wide range of events and activities including yoga, flower clubs, art exhibitions, plays, carol concerts and other events. The Hall is available for hire and is used widely for local family events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 12 February 1969: Standard registration
- THE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Ian Anderson | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Wilkin | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Kitchen | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICK HOOD | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.53k | £29.95k | £13.42k | £7.55k | £8.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.44k | £63.45k | £12.55k | £7.01k | £9.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.44k | £8.37k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 23RD OCTOBER, 1968
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
LAMORNA VALLEY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Post Office
Lamorna
Penzance
TR19 6XQ
- Phone:
- 01736731210
- Email:
- lamornavillagehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window