MAWGAN PORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 300569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Mawgan Porth Village Hall lies at the centre of this small community and is currently used for a variety of activities by the village and surrounding area, being situated midway between the towns of Newquay and Padstow. It provides an attractive and inviting venue for a variety of functions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £17,570
Total expenditure: £11,455

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew BORRETT Chair 23 May 2018
None on record
Steven Williams Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Deborah Hopkins Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Barbara Slack-Larsen Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Mark Andrew Townsend Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Charles Lawson Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Trevor Vercoe Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Lian Locke Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
Gillian THOMAS Trustee 17 May 2017
None on record
Deborah Joy CARTER Trustee 17 May 2017
None on record
JANE LESLEY BALL Trustee
None on record
VIVIEN FARMER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.26k £16.10k £26.01k £18.75k £17.57k
Total expenditure £30.39k £7.09k £19.76k £13.98k £11.46k
Income from government contracts N/A £24 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £10.10k £11.17k £500 £500

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 March 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 March 2023 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Polwithen
St. Mawgan
NEWQUAY
Cornwall
TR8 4EW
Phone:
01637860013