Financial history St Dominick Parish Hall

Charity number: 300609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £16.44k £21.60k £13.89k £10.53k £10.88k
Total expenditure £4.08k £6.19k £6.74k £45.84k £7.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £16.26k £2.67k £150 N/A