St Dominick Parish Hall

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All activities associated with parish halls-hiring hall to local organisations eg, Tuesday club, gardening club, hobbies group, also fund raising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 18 July 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charmian Saunders | Chair | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Irvine Lindsay | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Greene | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Walker | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Potter | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Prosser | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Cox | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Curnow | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Hodge | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Julie Wenmoth | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.44k | £21.60k | £13.89k | £10.53k | £10.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.08k | £6.19k | £6.74k | £45.84k | £7.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £16.26k | £2.67k | £150 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 9TH MAY 1953 as amended on 10 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST DOMINIC AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Dominick Parish Hall
St. Dominick
SALTASH
Cornwall
PL12 6TD
- Phone:
- 01579351302
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window