Trustees St Dominick Parish Hall
Charity number: 300609

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charmian Saunders | Chair | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Irvine Lindsay | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Greene | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Walker | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Potter | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Prosser | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Cox | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Curnow | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Hodge | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Julie Wenmoth | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.