ST HILARY MEMORIAL GARDEN FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to promote interactive projects within the area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 05 February 1990: Standard registration
- ST HILARY MEMORIAL HALL AND PLAYING FIELD FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE HOWELLS | Chair |
|
||||||
THOMAS THOMAS | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL RYAN | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH VARDY | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER BEHRENS | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
madeleine dicker | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Denis Reed | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
paul rule paul rule | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5 FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ST HILARY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. HILARY
Contact information
- Address:
-
IONA
LUKES LANE
ST. HILARY
PENZANCE
TR20 9DY
- Phone:
- 01736763311
- Email:
- roger.calfe@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window