St Mawes Recreation Ground

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running play ground and youth hut
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 17 April 1967: Standard registration
- RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simone Kennett | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Charles Good | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Toogood | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA MARY PRIDMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES PRIDMORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.26k | £16.18k | £23.96k | £23.25k | £9.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.64k | £7.42k | £10.06k | £11.66k | £19.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 8TH JULY 1966 as amended on 19 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND LAND OR PREMISES OCCUPIED FOR PURPOSES OF FOUNDATION. 2. LAND SITUATE AT ST. MAYES, BEING PART O.S.NOS. 603,692 AND 714 AND ADJOINING LAND ABOVE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. JUST-IM-ROSELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 PEN BREA CLOSE
ST. MAWES
TRURO
TR2 5UN
- Phone:
- 01326270910
- Email:
- Grosewall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window