STRATTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 300636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

organising and running a community hall for the benefit of the Stratton and district community including education and health activities, social events, sports and providing support for people with disabilities. Supporting local culture and religious groups and a venue for public meetings forums and neighbourhood support groups

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,023
Total expenditure: £4,734

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 April 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STRATTON COMMUNITY HALL (Working name)
  • STRATTON COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Paul Carpenter Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
TERESA MARY ABBOTS Trustee 19 May 2016
None on record
BARRY NORMAN BRYNE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.08k £11.10k £106.85k £46.08k £14.02k
Total expenditure £3.38k £7.13k £104.82k £53.16k £4.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.00k £3.67k N/A £400

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 15 APRIL 1970
Charitable objects
THE TRUST PROPERTY SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST AS A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF A COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION FORMED TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE STRATTON WARD OF THE BUDE-STRATTON URBAN DISTRICT AS AT PRESENT CONSTITUTED (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
BUDE-STRATTON URBAN DISTRICT
Registration history
  • 17 April 2000 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
31 Pintail Close
Bude
Cornwall
EX23 8FQ
Phone:
01288488159
Website:

No information available