THE CORNWALL FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A) To advance the education of young members of the public in agriculture, home crafts, country life and related subjects. and B) In the interest of social welfare to provide and promote the provision of facilities for recreation and leisure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 10 September 1987: Standard registration
- CFYFC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOPHIE OLDS | Chair | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
BETHANY WHELL | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Milly Bersey | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE WORDEN | Trustee | 11 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.85k | £82.12k | £224.51k | £227.57k | £263.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.67k | £114.69k | £210.09k | £206.24k | £251.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 AUGUST 1972
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS; 2)IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY Y
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF CORNWALL
Linked charities
- 10 September 1987 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAERHAYES SUITE
PAVILLION CENTRE
ROYAL CORNWALL SHOWGROUND
WHITECROSS
WADEBRIDGE
CORNWALL
- Phone:
- 01208893080
- Email:
- office@cornwallyfc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window