Trustees 3RD BUCKINGHAM SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 300658

Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Robert Armitage | Chair | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil David Blunstone | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Frances Grensted | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Louise McLaughlin | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Corin Jonathan Brearley | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Tebboth | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr Rob Streat | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tina Louise Anderson | Trustee | 11 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.