CHESHAM DIVISION OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girl Guiding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £175 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 13 March 1962: Standard registration
- CHESHAM GUIDE HEADQUARTERS (Working name)
- CHESHAM DIVISION OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Ann Hall | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Susan Barros | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIAN ELIZABETH LE GALLAIS | Trustee | 28 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS LIBBY ODELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LISA DAWN FORD | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRIAN RICHARD GOWLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.09k | £13.14k | £14.36k | £8.99k | £10.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.85k | £6.02k | £8.65k | £12.06k | £11.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | £175 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 24 NOVEMBER, 1952 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1938
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE CHESHAM DIVISION OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
CHESHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 LOWNDES AVENUE
CHESHAM
HP5 2HH
- Phone:
- 01494775401
- Email:
- briangowlett@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window