1ST GERRARDS CROSS GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
education,sport,religious activities,arts,culture,environment,conservation,heritage,health,training,other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 12 February 1965: Standard registration
- 1ST GERRARDS CROSS GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Megan Amber Duignan | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Hyett | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Julie Bridden | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Valerie Leah | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.96k | £658 | £6.76k | £3.77k | £3.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.06k | £843 | £2.60k | £4.18k | £3.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1963 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1938
Charitable objects
1ST GERRARDS CROSS GIRL GUIDES
Area of benefit
GERRARDS CROSS
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Station Road
GERRARDS CROSS
SL9 8ES
- Phone:
- 07719914031
- Email:
- guides1stgx@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
gxanddenham.cfsites.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window