Trustees 1ST WENDOVER SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 300695
Up to date (85 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Anthony Fines-Allin | Chair | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Robert White | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roy Coates | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
JULIA FISH | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Inkley | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Cameron | Trustee | 01 January 2008 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stride | Trustee | 01 January 1979 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.