28TH CAMBRIDGE (ST JOHN'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs activities for young people aged 6 and upwards.These activities included weekly group meetings, social activities, skill based activities. training opportunities and overnight camps.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 21 June 1971: Standard registration
- 28TH CAMBRIDGE SCOUTS (Working name)
- 28TH CAMBRIDGE (ST JOHN'S) GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATE CHURCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Elaine Bennett | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP COLLIGAN | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katharine Laura Gerlach | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR GEOFF OLIVER | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEREMY WILSON RACHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.22k | £28.84k | £36.76k | £46.13k | £53.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.91k | £31.58k | £29.07k | £56.04k | £48.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £17.37k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE SCOUT TRUST DEED 1969 AND LEASE DATED 17 DECEMBER 1970.
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Hinton Avenue
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 7AR
- Phone:
- 01223245531
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window