1ST ST AUSTELL SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Scout group provides scoutings everyday adventure. To Young people in and around the St Austell Area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 08 October 1963: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 February 2011: Standard registration
- 1ST ST AUSTELL BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER JOHN POWLESLAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sally Breton | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katy Potter | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ELLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BENJAMIN POWLESLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.88k | £38.15k | £26.30k | £10.06k | £18.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.40k | £19.53k | £24.21k | £18.54k | £19.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2024 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2025 | 731 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2024 | 714 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2025 | 1096 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2024 | 1079 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967, 19 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED ON 8 FEBRUARY 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
ST. AUSTELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 TRENOWAH ROAD
ST. AUSTELL
PL25 3EB
- Phone:
- 07970210148
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window