BEER VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a village hall building, with a main hall at ground floor level plus stage, kitchen, male & female cloakroom facilities and disabled toilet. Upstairs a meeting room and bar. Hall is used by all organisations in BEER for meetings, sports (eg badminton, bowls) and other recreational activities (eg dance classes, pilates, pantomime, dinners/dances, WI, RNLI, craft, fairs).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 08 August 1962: Standard registration
- MARINER'S HALL,BEER (Working name)
- THE MARINERS HALL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEER PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.41k | £15.33k | £28.87k | £24.23k | £21.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.86k | £11.82k | £20.27k | £22.67k | £26.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.10k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1950
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BEER
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BEER
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Barn
Fore Street
Beer
Seaton
EX12 3JB
- Phone:
- 0129720014
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window