Trustees CLOVELLY RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 300796

Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Augustus Henry SANDERS | Chair | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas PAWSON | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Maureen WEST | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Henry HUXTABLE | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Milton WEST | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Sandra HUXTABLE | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Noel HODGETT | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham BRAUN | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan KELLY | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Berkley James Selby KELLY | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rae Marianne VANSTONE | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil James WONNACOTT | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|||||
David LANGFORD | Trustee | 13 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR R J VANSTONE | Trustee | 11 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Joanna HAZELL | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Robert DAVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Adrian Harold TUCKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.