Financial history DUNSFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 300819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £7.71k £12.61k £12.07k £8.59k £14.36k
Total expenditure £8.25k £4.93k £9.43k £21.99k £10.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A