Accounts and annual returns EAST DOWN OLD SCHOOL

Charity number: 300821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 31 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 August 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required