Financial history EAST DOWN OLD SCHOOL

Charity number: 300821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £13.63k £9.05k £4.45k £3.67k £17.18k
Total expenditure £5.94k £3.00k £4.34k £4.40k £15.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A £200