Financial history EXETER UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 300828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.82k £15.30k £30.32k £9.24k £11.55k
Total expenditure £10.50k £13.82k £25.53k £9.68k £28.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A