Trustees EXETER UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 300828

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN PAYNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Marian Guest | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Guest | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Davies | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marina Hodder | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mike Warlow | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Warlow | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Wood | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Susan Payne | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND FLACK | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.