Financial history STANHOPE PARK

Charity number: 300861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.31k £30 £2.47k £0 £0
Total expenditure £10.13k £9.18k £15.04k £11.15k £12.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A