HUNTSHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise and hold fund-raising activities, hire out hall premises
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 23 January 1963: Standard registration
- HUNTSHAM VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- TROYTE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DERWYN PIERCE | Chair | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lenferna de la Motte | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR J SADY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.42k | £20.29k | £8.97k | £7.87k | £10.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.97k | £17.97k | £12.47k | £7.46k | £8.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 August 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 28 SEPTEMBER 1962 as amended on 13 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
HUNTSHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOOR COTTAGE
HUNTSHAM
TIVERTON
EX16 7NF
- Phone:
- 01398361329
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window