ILFRACOMBE UNIT 193 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 300868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charitable purpose of the Unit is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,185
Total expenditure: £8,873

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • T.S CAPSTONE (Working name)
  • UNIT 193, SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Thorn Trustee 11 November 2024
None on record
Lauren Townsend PO Trustee 11 November 2024
None on record
Holly Turner-Bond Trustee 11 November 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.93k £12.79k £4.90k £2.00k £3.19k
Total expenditure £11.02k £4.86k £17.01k £6.00k £8.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ropery Road
Ilfracombe
EX34 9EF
Phone:
01271 862890
Website:

sea-cadets.org/ilfracombe