ILSINGTON PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides space and amenities for recreation and sports
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 29 June 1971: Standard registration
- IPFARA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILLIP JAMES SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mervyn Wills | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Joanna Limb | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|||||
John Heathman | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.02k | £42.94k | £6.19k | £18.38k | £6.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.44k | £38.58k | £883 | £24.84k | £9.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.60k | £10.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 August 2024 | 287 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2024 | 652 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2022 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2021 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONTITUTION DATED 16TH FEBRUARY 1971
Charitable objects
PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
ILSINGTON - DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 Summerhill Road
Liverton
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ12 6HF
- Phone:
- 01626363338
- Email:
- philsmith412@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window