Trustees Kingston Reading Room

Charity number: 300882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carolyn Mary Beard Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Sarah Banham Trustee 06 February 2024
None on record
Juliet Manners Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Guy Richard John Walker Trustee 22 July 2020
None on record
Benjamin Russell Trustee 11 June 2020
None on record
Andrew Edward Summer-Nutting Trustee 14 August 2018
None on record
Alan Coleman-Smith Trustee 05 April 2018
CARITAS WOKINGHAM
Received: On time
Jennifer May Kinder Trustee 06 February 2018
None on record
Pauline Deschamps Trustee 06 November 2014
None on record
TINA ALETTA MEARS Trustee 08 July 2012
None on record