LANDSCOVE WELCOME HOME AND VICTORY HALL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain the Victory Hall and encourage its use for activities for the benefit of the inhabitants of Landscove. To raise money to facilitate the above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 10 October 1963: Standard registration
- LANDSCOVE VICTORY HALL (Working name)
- LANDSCOVE WELCOME HOME AND VILLAGE HALL FUND (Previous name)
- VICTORY HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Morgan | Chair | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Wendy Ann Warren | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Harvey | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Pascoe | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jennings | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lipscombe | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Max Eastwood | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Eastwood | Trustee | 02 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Baber | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Hammersley | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.60k | £9.93k | £4.33k | £6.11k | £7.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.85k | £8.47k | £6.23k | £5.43k | £8.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23/07/1952 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/01/2013
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF LANDSCOVE AND THE IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Orchard Barn
Landscove
Ashburton
Newton Abbot
TQ13 7LZ
- Phone:
- 01803762868
- Email:
- GILESHAMMERSLEY@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window