Financial history THE VICTORY HALL

Charity number: 300912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £18.08k £15.15k £13.08k £8.37k £4.23k
Total expenditure £17.66k £8.44k £8.44k £7.62k £5.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.18k £11.37k £10.00k N/A N/A