FOXHOLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities and possible funding for a complete range of community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Torbay
Governance
- 13 April 1967: Standard registration
- FOXHOLE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Shepherd-Burridge | Chair | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ambrose | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Louise Shepherd-Burridge | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHARLIE BURRDIGE | Trustee | 21 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ELIZABETH BURRIDGE | Trustee | 21 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.74k | £38.94k | £16.98k | £11.94k | £25.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.53k | £31.12k | £12.57k | £16.95k | £21.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST MARCH 1967
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE LOCALITY OF FOXHOLE IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF PAIGNTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Lanhydrock Close
PAIGNTON
Devon
TQ3 3GP
- Phone:
- 01803558000
- Email:
- trev25678@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
Www.foxholecommunitycentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window