SOUTH WEST ENVIRONMENTAL PARKS LIMITED

Charity number: 300923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's activities are to advance scientific knowledge of plants, animals and the natural world; to advance education on the conservation of the physical and natural world and the promotion of biodiversity; to promote the conservation of the physical and the natural environment and the maintenance of the physical and natural environment and the maintenance of biological diversity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Torbay

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NEWQUAY ZOO (Working name)
  • PAIGNTON ZOO (Working name)
  • PAIGNTON ZOO ENVIRONMENTAL PARK (Working name)
  • THE PAIGNTON ZOOLOGICAL AND BOTANICAL GARDENS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Cooper Chair 16 December 2021
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
THE WHITLEY WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Melanie Skipp Trustee 11 September 2024
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
THE WHITLEY WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
JAMES O'DWYER Trustee 15 April 2024
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
THE WHITLEY WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
STOVER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Ben Louis Jobson Trustee 12 February 2024
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
THE WHITLEY WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Prof. Richard Preziosi Trustee 28 September 2022
THE WHITLEY WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
Beth Kathleen McLaughlin Trustee 22 October 2015
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
THE WHITLEY WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
SARAH BARR Trustee 01 August 2013
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
THE WHITLEY WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
ANDREW CHARLES JOHN COOPER BSC Trustee 20 April 2012
LIVING COASTS
Received: On time
EAST DEVON PEBBLEBED HEATHS CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
WILD PLANET TRUST
Received: On time
THE WHITLEY WILDLIFE CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £13.03m £9.11m £8.60m £9.20m £8.26m
Total expenditure £12.49m £11.89m £8.04m £9.31m £10.90m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £696.02k £182.44k £12.00k £54.46k
Income - Donations and legacies £927.85k £1.12m £521.36k £960.71k £215.12k
Income - Other trading activities £3.86m £2.20m £9.93k £24.33k £111.03k
Income - Charitable activities £8.20m £5.54m £7.90m £7.20m £7.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £28.47k £12.11k £151.03k £978.16k £524.34k
Income - Other £16.54k £232.47k £17.20k £36.43k £16.69k
Income - Legacies £555.04k £0 £3.65k £744.01k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.72m £10.08m £8.02m £9.30m £10.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.76m £1.81m £16.32k £11.33k £50
Expenditure - Governance £18.29k £10.75k £21.30k £8.82k £11.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Own use assets £5.60m £4.68m £4.42m £4.58m £5.03m
Long-term investments £0 £2 £2 £2 £2
Other assets £6.29m £7.14m £7.02m £6.33m £3.13m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.51m £4.22m £3.46m £3.04m £2.92m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 29 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 12 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 19 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 29 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 01 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 01 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PAIGNTON ZOO
TOTNES ROAD
PAIGNTON
DEVON
TQ4 7EU
Phone:
01803697500
Email:
No information available