Trustees PARKHAM ALLARDICE HALL
Charity Number: 300924

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Sargent | Chair | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Smith | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Parry | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lang | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madelaine Goodyear | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Whitfield | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Alice Lewis | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Lang | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Beer | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nick Day | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Oldham | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Garry Jennings | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Sanders | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BROOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY LANG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP JOHN PRIEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET MARY CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.